Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-280
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-280
Title:Nicholas Purpura, Petitioner
v.
Chris Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:August 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3173)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2017)
Sep 05 2017Waiver of right of respondents Federal Respondents to respond filed.
Sep 05 2017Waiver of right of respondents Chris Christie, Governor of NJ, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 12 2017Waiver of right of respondent Township of Montville o/b/o Richard Cook and Township of Andover o/b/o Achille Tagliatella to respond filed.
Sep 15 2017Letter received 9-19-2017, from petitioner Nicholas E. Purpura.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017Petition DENIED.
Nov 17 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas E. Purpura1802 Rue de la Port Drive
Wall, NJ 07719

732-449-0856
Party name: Nicholas Purpura
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Brian William Mason
    Counsel of Record
Mason Thompson, LLC
50 Nelson Street
Dover, NJ 07801

bwm@masonthompsonlaw.com
973-366-9300
Party name: Township of Montville o/b/o Richard Cook and Township of Andover o/b/o Achille Tagliatella
Benjamin H. Zieman
    Counsel of Record
Department of Law and Public Safety Division of Law
RJ Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, PO Box 116
Trenton , NJ 08625-0116

benjamin.zieman@lps.state.nj.us
(609) 292-1575
Party name: Chris Christie, Governor of NJ, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543