Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-258
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-258
Title:David Elliott, et al., Petitioners
v.
Google, Inc.
Docketed:August 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15809)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2017)
Sep 14 2017Waiver of right of respondent Google, Inc. to respond filed.
Sep 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Daniel Foster
    Counsel of Record
TDFoster - Intellectual Property Law
11622 El Camino Real, Suite 100
San Diego, CA 92130

foster@tdfoster.com
(858) 922-2170
Party name: David Elliott, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Angela L. Dunning
    Counsel of Record
Cooley, LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

adunning@cooley.com
650-843-5000
Party name: Google, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543