Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-249
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-249
Title:Amy Young and John Scott, as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of Andrew Lee Scott, Deceased, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gary S. Borders, Sheriff, Lake County, Florida, et al.
Docketed:August 17, 2017
Linked with 16A1133
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-14673)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2017Application (16A1133) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2017 to August 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 22 2017Application (16A1133) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 13, 2017.
Aug 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2017)
Aug 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 17, 2017.
Sep 18 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Sep 18 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Rutherford Institute.
Nov 16 2017Response to motion of the Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. from respondents Gary S. Borders, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2017Response to motion of the Rutherford Institute from respondents Gary S. Borders, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2017Brief of respondents Gary S. Borders, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Rutherford Institute GRANTED.
Jan 08 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. GRANTED.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Dorothy Frances Easley
    Counsel of Record
Easley Appellate Practice, PLLC
1200 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1950
Miami, FL 33131

administration@easleyappellate.com
(305) 444-1599
Party name: Amy Young, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda LeVines Winchenbach
    Counsel of Record
John M. Green, JR., P.A.
125 NE 1st Avenue, Suite 2
Ocala, FL 34470-6675

lwinchenbach@me.com
352-732-9252
Party name: Gary S. Borders, et al.
Other
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura, PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
(703) 835-9085
Party name: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
923 Gardens Boulevard
Charlottesville, VA 22901

johnw@rutherford.org
434-978-3888
Party name: Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543