Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-243
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-243
Title:Liban H. Abdirahman, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-206)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2017
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2017)
Jul 31 2017Appendix of Liban H. Abdirahman filed. (Volumes 1 & 2)
Sep 18 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 22 2017Letter dated September 20, 2017, received from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply under Rule 15.5.
Sep 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Mar 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Liban H. Abdirahman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Supplemental brief of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED.
Jul 09 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 06 2018The petition for rehearing is granted. The order entered June 28, 2018, denying the petition for a writ of certiorari is vacated as to petitioner Michael Briggs. The petition for a writ of certiorari as to Michael Briggs is granted. The judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces for further consideration in light of United States v. Mangahas, 77 M. J. 220 (2018).
Sep 07 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

stephen.vladeck@aya.yale.edu
(512) 475-9198
Party name: Liban H. Abdirahman
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543