Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-23
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-23
Title:Carlos E. Moore, Petitioner
v.
Dewey P. Bryant, Governor of Mississippi
Docketed:June 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60616)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2017)
Jul 10 2017Waiver of right of respondent Dewey P. Bryant, Governor of Mississippi to respond filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 31 2017Brief amici curiae of The Southern Poverty Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of the Congressional Black Caucus, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 29 2017Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2017)
Sep 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Brief of respondent Dewey Phillip Bryant, Governor of Mississippi in opposition filed.
Oct 27 2017Reply of petitioner Carlos E. Moore filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 27 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Timothy Scott
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
1717 Arch Street, Suite 3100
Philadelphia, PA 19103-0000

mscott@reedsmith.com
215 851 8248
Party name: Carlos E. Moore
Attorneys for Respondent
Harold Edward Pizzetta III
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Mississippi Attorney General
450 High Street
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

hpizz@ago.state.ms.us
601-359-3680
Party name: Dewey Phillip Bryant, Governor of Mississippi
Other
Ronald Clement Machen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

ronald.machen@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Members of the Congressional Black Caucus, et al.
Gregory J. Wallance
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019

gregory.wallance@apks.com
(212) 836-8000
Party name: The Southren Poverty Law Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543