Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-216
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-216
Vide 17-215
Title:Town of Aquinnah, Massachusetts, et al., Petitioners
v.
The Wampanoag Tribe of Gay Head (Aquinnah), et al.
Docketed:August 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1137)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2017)
Sep 06 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Felicia H. Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

felicia.ellsworth@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6687
Party name: Aquinnah, MA, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lael Echo-Hawk
    Counsel of Record
Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP
2120 L Street, NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20037

(202) 822-8282
Party name: The Wampanoag Tribe of Gay Head, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543