Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-204
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-204
Title:Apple Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert Pepper, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15000)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2017)
Sep 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondents Robert Pepper, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by ACT The App Association.
Sep 15 2017Objection to motions of the App Association and the Washington Legal Foundation to fie briefs in support of petitioner from respondents Robert Pepper, et al. filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 20 2017Reply of petitioner Apple Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel M. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.wall@lw.com
(415) 391-0600
Party name: Apple Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Carl Rifkin
    Counsel of Record
270 Madison Ave.
New York, NY 10016

jaffe@whafh.com
(212) 545-4600
Party name: Robert Pepper, et al.
Other
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

bscarpelli@actionline.org
517-507-1446
Party name: ACT The App Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543