Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-197
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-197
Title:Roger French, Petitioner
v.
Karla Starr, Judge, CRIT Tribal Appellate Court, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15470)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2017)
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondents Karla Starr, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 19 2017Reply of petitioner Roger French filed. (Distributed)
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roger French
    Counsel of Record
18001 Cowan
Suite J
Irvine, CA 92614

rvrrat3@cox.net
949-697-3246
Party name: Roger French
Attorneys for Respondents
Rob Roy Smith
    Counsel of Record
1420 Fifth Ave.
Suite 4400
Seattle, WA 98101

rrsmith@kilpatricktownsend.com
(206)-467-9600
Party name: Karla Starr, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543