Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-190
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-190
Title:Defense Distributed, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of State, et al.
Docketed:August 4, 2017
Linked with 16A1033
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-50759)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2017Application (16A1033) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to August 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Apr 26 2017Application (16A1033) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 2, 2017.
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Representative Thomas Massie, et al. filed.
Sep 21 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2017.
Nov 02 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2017.
Nov 07 2017Brief of respondent Department of State in opposition filed.
Nov 27 2017Reply of petitioners Defense Distributed, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
(703) 835-9085
Party name: Defense Distributed, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of State
Other
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright & Close, LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
713-572-4321
Party name: Representative Thomas Massie, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543