Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-184
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-184
Title:Great Plains Lending, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Docketed:August 3, 2017
Linked with 16A1254
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-55900)
   Decision Date:January 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2017Application (16A1254) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2017 to August 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 23 2017Application (16A1254) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 3, 2017.
Aug 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 14 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Great Plains Lending, LLC, et al. on 08/15/2017
Aug 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Native American Financial Services Association filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Great Plains Lending, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: CFPB
Other
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@gmail.com
(405) 521-3921
Party name: States of Oklahoma, et al.
Michael Flynn McBride
    Counsel of Record
Van Ness Feldman, LLP
1050 Thomas Jefferson St., N.W., Suite 700
Washington, DC 20007

mfm@vnf.com
202-298-1800
Party name: Native American Financial Services Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543