Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-179
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-179
Title:Edward Blackorby, Petitioner
v.
BNSF Railway Company
Docketed:August 3, 2017
Linked with 16A1233
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3192)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2017Application (16A1233) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2017 to August 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jun 19 2017Application (16A1233) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 2, 2017.
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 03 2017Waiver of right of respondent BNSF Railway Company to respond filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 29 2017Brief amicus curiae of Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes filed. (Distributed)
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

dgoldberg@law.stanford.edu
(650) 498-8229
Party name: Edward Blackorby
Attorneys for Respondent
Bryan Patrick Neal
    Counsel of Record
1722 Routh Street
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

bryan.neal@tklaw.com
214-969-1762
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Other
Lawrence Moses Mann
    Counsel of Record
Alper & Mann, PC
9205 Redwood Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20817

mann.larrym@gmail.com
202-298-9191
Party name: Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys
Harry W. Zanville
    Counsel of Record
10740 El Marbea Lane
La Mesa, CA 91941

hwzlaw@gmail.com
(619-400-7164
Party name: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543