Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-171
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-171
Title:Papierfabrik August Koehler SE, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1067
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1489)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2017Application (16A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2017 to July 31, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 09 2017Application (16A1067) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 31, 2017.
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017.
Sep 26 2017Waiver of right of respondent Appvion, Inc. to respond filed.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 17 2017Reply of petitioner Papierfabrick August Koehler SE filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 11 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Frederick Wood
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed
1775 I Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

john.wood@hugheshubbard.com
2027214720
Party name: Papierfabrick August Koehler SE
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel Lawrence Schneiderman
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

dschneiderman@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Appvion, Inc.
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543