Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1708
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1708
Title:Adonia K. Smith, Petitioner
v.
Loudoun County Public Schools
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1355
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2435)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2018Application (17A1355) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 11 2018Application (17A1355) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 24, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2018Brief of respondent Loudon County Public Schools in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis P. Derrick
    Counsel of Record
7 Winthrop Street
Essex, MA 01929-1203

dennisderrick@comcast.net
9787686610
Party name: Adonia smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Julia Bougie Judkins
    Counsel of Record
Suite 400
9990 Fairfax Blvd.
Suite 400
Fairfax, VA 22030

jjudkins@bmhjlaw.com
7033851000
Party name: Loudon County Public Schools

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543