Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1702
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1702
Title:Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
DeeDee Halleck, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4155)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel for Petitioners, Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Blanket Consent
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 25 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chicago Access Corporation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondents Deedee Halleck, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioners Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 12 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chicago Access Corporation GRANTED.
Oct 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Oct 24 2018Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018Joint supplement to motion for extension of time filed.
Main Document
Nov 15 2018Joint motion of the parties to file the brief on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 4, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2019. The reply brief is to be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Dec 04 2018Brief of petitioners Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Internet Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chicago Access Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of NCTA – The Internet & Television Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and TechFreedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 25, 2019.
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Jan 11 2019Brief of respondents DeeDee Halleck, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 14 2019Record request from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit is electronic.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2019Brief amici curiae of The Alliance for Community Media, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Police Accountability Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Brief amici curiae of New York County Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Brief amici curiae of THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, NEW YORK CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AND NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST CENSORSHIP, filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Reply of petitioners Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Argued. For petitioners: Michael B. de Leeuw, New York, N. Y. For respondents: Paul W. Hughes, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael B. de Leeuw
    Counsel of Record
Cozen O'Connor
45 Broadway Atrium
16th Floor
New York, NY 10006

mdeleeuw@cozen.com
(212) 908-1331
Party name: Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: DEEDEE HALLECK, et al.
Other
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, NEW YORK CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AND NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST CENSORSHIP,
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: The Cato Institute
Katherine A. Fallow
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

katie.fallow@knightcolumbia.org
646-745-8500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

chad.golder@mto.com
(202) 220-1103
Party name: Internet Association
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

davidg@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
James Ned Horwood
    Counsel of Record
Speigel & McDiarmid, LLP
1875 Eye Street NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

james.horwood@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: The Alliance for Community Media, The Alliance for Communications Democracy, and the National Association of Telecommunications Officers and Advisors
Carolyn A. Kubitschek
    Counsel of Record
Lansner & Kubitschek
325 Broadway
Suite 203
New York, NY 10007

ckubitschek@lanskub.com
2123490900
Party name: New York County Lawyers Association
James M. Manley
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3217 E. Shea Blvd.
#108
Phoenix, AZ 85028

JManley@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Chicago Access Corporation
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: National Police Accountability Project
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Howard Jeffrey Symons
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

HSymons@jenner.com
202-639-6078
Party name: NCTA – The Internet & Television Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543