Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-170
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-170
Title:DTE Energy Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2274, 14-2275)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 31 2017Brief amici curiae of The Electric Reliability Corrdinating Council, et al. filed.
Sep 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent Sierra Club in opposition filed.
Nov 15 2017Reply of petitioners DTE Energy Company, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Letter received from counsel for petitioners December 8, 2017. (Distributed)
Dec 11 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
F. William Brownell
    Counsel of Record
Hunton & Williams LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

bbrownell@hunton.com
(202) 955-1500
Party name: DTE Energy Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael Soules
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
1625 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Suite 702
Washington , DC 20036

msoules@earthjustice.org
2026674500
Party name: Sierra Club
Other
Scott Howard Segal
    Counsel of Record
Bracewell, LLP
2001 M Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20036

scott.segal@bracewell.com
(202)-828-5845
Party name: The Electric Reliability Corrdinating Council, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543