Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1686
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1686
Title:RPX Corporation, Petitioner
v.
ChanBond LLC
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Linked with 17A1057
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2346)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2018Application (17A1057) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 17, 2018 to June 16, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Application (17A1057) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 16, 2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2018Letter of June 28, 2018, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Main Document
Jul 09 2018Waiver of right of respondent Chanbond LLC to respond filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Askeladden LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Initiative for Medicines Access & Knowledge (I-Mak) and Patients for Affordable Drugs, Inc. (P4AD) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Response Requested. (Due August 24, 2018)
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondent Chanbond LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioner RPX Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel B. Ravicher
    Counsel of Record
2000 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Ste 600
Coral Gables, FL 33134

dan@ravicher.com
7865051205
Party name: RPX Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrea Pacelli
    Counsel of Record
Mishcon de Reya New York LLP
156 Fifth Avenue, Suite 904
New York, NY 10010

andrea.pacelli@mishcon.com
212-612-3267
Party name: Chanbond LLC
Other
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
212-336-8000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Askeladden LLC
Aditya Neal Seth
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LL P
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

nseth@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The Initiative for Medicines Access & Knowledge (I-Mak) and Patients for Affordable Drugs, Inc. (P4AD)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543