Jun 14 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2018) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jul 02 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2018 to August 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2018. |
| |
Aug 08 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 20 2018 | Reply of petitioner Vanessa Stuart filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 22 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
| |
Sep 18 2018 | Record Requested. |
| |
Sep 24 2018 | Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic. |
| |
Sep 26 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018. |
| |
Oct 10 2018 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Oct 22 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018. |
| |
Oct 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018. |
| |
Nov 05 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018. |
| |
Nov 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018. |
| |
Nov 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Sotomayor joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
| |