Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1656
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1656
Title:Violet Dock Port, Inc., LLC, Petitioner
v.
St. Bernard Port, Harbor, & Terminal District
Docketed:June 11, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2017--0434)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C.
Blanket Consent
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2018.
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Owners' Counsel of America, Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Amicus brief of NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation, New England Legal Foundation, and Rutherford Institute not accepted for filing. (July 13, 2018) (Brief to be resubmitted as a motion for leave to file a brief of amici curiae)
Jul 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation, New England Legal Foundation, and Rutherford Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2018Motion to extend further the time to file a response from August 10, 2018 to September 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2018

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Scott Hastings
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
2200 Ross Ave.
Suite 2800
Dallas, TX 75201-6776

shastings@lockelord.com
(214) 740-8537
Party name: Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
James M. Garner
    Counsel of Record
Sher Garner Cahill Richter Klein & Hilbert, LLC
909 Poydras Street
28th Floor
New Orleans, LA 70112

jgarner@shergarner.com
504299-2102
Party name: St. Bernard Port, Harbor, & Terminal District
Other
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 Northeast 33rd Place, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
425-576-0484
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America, Institute for Justice
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
916-384-7648
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation, New England Legal Foundation, and Rutherford Institute.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543