Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1648
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1648
Title:The GEO Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Alejandro Menocal, et al.
Docketed:June 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1125)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent Alejandro Menocal, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Emery
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright, US, LLP
799 9th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mark.emery@nortonrosefulbright.com
202-662-0210
Party name: The GEO Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Patrick David Lopez
    Counsel of Record
Outten & Golden LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 200W
Washington, DC 20001

pdl@outtengolden.com
202-847-4400
Party name: Alejandro Menocal, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543