Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1646
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1646
Title:LeFloris Lyon, Petitioner
v.
Canadian National Railway Co., et al.
Docketed:June 11, 2018
Linked with 17A796
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2684)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2018Application (17A796) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Application (17A796) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 4, 2018.
Apr 04 2018Motion (17M126) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Apr 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Appendix of LeFloris Lyon filed.
Other
May 22 2018MOTION (17M126) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018Motion (17M126) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Jun 21 2018Waiver of right of respondents Wise Carter Child & Caraway, P.A. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 15 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner LeFloris Lyon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
LeFloris LyonP.O. Box 87245
Chicago, IL 60680

(601) 259-0033
Party name: LeFloris Lyon
Attorneys for Respondents
James Daniel Helenhouse
    Counsel of Record
Fletcher & Sippel LLC
29 N. Wacker Drive
Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60606-3208

jhelenhouse@fletcher-sippel.com
312-252-1500
Party name: Wise Carter Child & Caraway, P.A.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543