Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-163
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-163
Title:Chad M. Jarreau, et al., Petitioners
v.
South Lafourche Levee District
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1146
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2016-C-0788, 2016-C-0904)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 19 2017Application (16A1146) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 29, 2017 to July 31, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 25 2017Application (16A1146) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 31, 2017.
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 10 2017Waiver of right of respondent South Lafourche Levee District to respond filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 22 2017Response Requested. (Due September 21, 2017)
Aug 29 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Sep 21 2017Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Sep 21 2017Brief of respondent South Lafourche Levee District in opposition filed.
Sep 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Don Howard Williams, Jr. filed.
Oct 05 2017Reply of petitioners Chad Jarreau, et al. filed.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
(703)-682-9320
Party name: Chad Jarreau, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Loulan Joseph Pitre
    Counsel of Record
400 Poydras Street, Suite 1812
New Orleans, LA 70130

loulan.pitre@kellyhart.com
504-522-1812
Party name: South Lafourche Levee District
Other
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 Northeast 33rd Place, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
(425)-576-0484
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
16th Floor
Honolulu, HI 96813

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Don Howard Williams, Jr.
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
2023142048
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543