Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1594
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1594
Title:Return Mail, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States Postal Service, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2018
Linked with 17A879
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1502)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2018Application (17A879) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 28 2018Application (17A879) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 14, 2018.
May 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Return Mail, Inc..
Blanket Consent
Jun 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Kenneth O. Simon filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2018Brief amici curiae of 15 Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondents United States Postal Service, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 21 2018Reply of petitioner Return Mail, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 26 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Nov 26 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Return Mail, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Dec 10 2018Brief of petitioner Return Mail, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard L. Rainey
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

rrainey@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Return Mail, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Postal Service, et al.
Other
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mjdowd@dowdpllc.com
(202) 559-9175
Party name: 15 Law Professors
Ralph Stanley Morris
    Counsel of Record
Cartee & Morris LLC
2325 HENRY ST.
Guntersville, AL 35976

stan@carteemorris.com
(256) 582-9500
Party name: Kenneth O. Simon

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543