Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1592
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1592
Title:Makah Indian Tribe, Petitioner
v.
Quileute Indian Tribe, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2018
Linked with 17A1058
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35824)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 19, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Application (17A1058) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 19, 2018 to May 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. (Justice Kennedy is recused.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Application (17A1058) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 21, 2018.
May 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018, for all respondents.
Jun 15 2018Letter of respondent Washington State Department of Fish and Wildlife of intent to file brief in support of the petition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 19 2018Waiver of right of respondents Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe and Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United Catcher Boats.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2018Brief of respondent Washington State Deparrtment of Fish and Wildlife in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief of respondents Quileute Indian Tribe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Reply of petitioner Makah Indian Tribe filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Waiver of right of respondent Tulalip Tribes to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United Catcher Boats GRANTED.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc D. Slonim
    Counsel of Record
Ziontz, Chestnut, et al.
2101 Fourth Avenue
Suite 1230
Seattle, WA 98121

mslonim@ziontzchestnut.com
2064481230
Party name: Makah Indian Tribe
Attorneys for Respondents
Jay Douglas Geck
    Counsel of Record
Washington Office of the Attorney
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

jay.geck@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Washington State Deparrtment of Fish and Wildlife
Lauren Jennifer King
    Counsel of Record
Foster Pepper PLLC
1111 Third Avenue, Suite 3000
Seattle, WA 98101

lauren.king@foster.com
(206) 447-4400
Party name: Quileute Indian Tribe, et al.
Lauren Patricia Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Lauren P. Rasmussen
1904 THIRD AVENUE SUITE 1030
Seattle, WA 98101

lauren@rasmussen-law.com
2066230900
Party name: Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe and Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe
Mason D. MorissetMorisset Schlosser Jozwiak & Somerville
811 1st Avenue
Suite 218
Seattle, WA 98104-1434

m.morisset@msaj.com
206-386-5200
Party name: Tulalip Tribes
Other
Daryl Langdon Joseffer
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

djoseffer@kslaw.com
(202) 626-2388
Party name: United Catcher Boats

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543