Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1590
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1590
Title:Integrated Technological Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
First Internet Bank of Indiana
Docketed:May 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1795)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2018Waiver of right of respondent First Internet Bank of Indiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Allen Max Chambers
    Counsel of Record
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman P.C.
1200 New Hampshire Avenue,
Suite 710
Washington, DC 20036

sachambers@pbnlaw.com
2025176324
Party name: Integrated Technological Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Mark Lechleiter
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN 46204

dml@faegrebd.com
317-237-1070
Party name: First Internet Bank of Indiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543