Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1583
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1583
Title:Robert Bales, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0055/AR)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2018Waiver of right of respondent United, States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John N. Maher
    Counsel of Record
Maher Legal Services PC
7 East Main Street
Number 1053
St. Charles, IL 60174

johnmaher@maherlegalservices.com
7084688155
Party name: Robert Bales
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United, States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543