Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1576
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1576
Title:Alfonso Ignacio Viggers, Petitioner
v.
Al-Azhar F. Pacha, et al.
Docketed:May 22, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(334522)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 5, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Brief of respondents Al-Azhar Pacha, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2018Reply of petitioner Alfonso Ignacio Viggers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alfonso Ignacio Viggers949 Valencia St.
San Francisco, CA 94110

(415) 648-8990
Party name: Alfonso Ignacio Viggers
Attorneys for Respondents
Deborah L. Brouwer
    Counsel of Record
Nemeth Law, P.C.
200 Talon Centre Dr.
Suite 200
Detroit, MI 48207

dbrouwer@nemethlawpc.com
3135675921
Party name: Al-Azhar Pacha, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543