Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1560
Title:Alfonso Ignacio Viggers, Petitioner
v.
Maria De La Merced Viggers
Docketed:May 17, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(332481)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 5, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alfonso Ignacio Viggers949 Valencia St.
San Francisco, CA 94110

iviggers@yahoo.com
(415) 648-8990
Party name: Alfonoso Ignacio Viggers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543