Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1519
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1519
Title:Homes for America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Sunoco Pipeline, L.P.
Docketed:May 8, 2018
Lower Ct:Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania
   Case Numbers:(565 CD 2016)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 22, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent Sunoco Pipeline, L.P. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Francis Faherty
    Counsel of Record
75 Cedar Avenue
Hershey, PA 17033

mfaherty@fahertylawfirm.com
(717) 256-3000
Party name: Homes for America
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert L. Byer
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
600 Grant ST
Suite 5010
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: Sunoco Pipeline, L.P.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543