Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1506
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1506
Title:Nextel Communications of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Docketed:May 3, 2018
Linked with 17A982
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(6 EAP 2016)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2018Application (17A982) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Mar 14 2018Application (17A982) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 4, 2018.
May 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2018Waiver of right of respondent Pennsylvania Department of Revenue to respond filed.
Main Document
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Council On State Taxation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to File
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Todd Sunhwae Kim
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000, East Tower
Washington, DC 20005

tskim@reedsmith.com
202-414-9290
Party name: Nextel Communications of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-783-3226
Party name: Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Other
Karl A. Frieden
    Counsel of Record
Council On State Taxation
122 C Street NW, Suite 330
Washington, DC 20001

kfrieden@cost.org
2024845215
Party name: Council On State Taxation
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Frederick J. NicelyCounsel On State Taxation
122 C Street NW
Suite 330
Washington, DC 20001-2109

fnicely@cost.org
2024845213
Party name: Council On State Taxation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543