Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1492
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1492
Title:Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Petitioner
v.
Planned Parenthood of Gulf Coast, Inc., et al.
Docketed:May 1, 2018
Linked with 17A810
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-30987)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 30 2018Application (17A810) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 01 2018Application (17A810) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 27, 2018.
Apr 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2018 to June 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2018.
May 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Seven Family Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Ninety Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2018Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood of Gulf Coast, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 02 2018Reply of petitioner Rebekah Gee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Rebekah Gee
Attorneys for Respondents
Carrie Y. Flaxman
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
1110 Vermont Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

carrie.flaxman@ppfa.org
2029734830
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Gulf Coast, Inc., et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
2101 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 525
Arlington, VA 22201

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: Ninety Members of Congress
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, et al.
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kevin Hayden Theriot
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

ktheriot@ADFlegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Twenty-Seven Family Policy Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543