Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1463
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1463
Title:Luis Segovia, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:April 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4240)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 15 2018Waiver of right of respondent Karen Kinney in her official capacity as Rock Island County Clerk to respond filed.
May 17 2018Waiver of right of respondents United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
May 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Voting Rights Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2018Waiver of right of respondents Board of Election Commissioners for the City of Chicago and Marisel A. Hernandez in her official capacity as Chairwoman of said Board to respond filed.
May 29 2018Response Requested. (Due June 28, 2018)
Jun 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2018.
Jun 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States Virgin Islands filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2018The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2018, for all respondents.
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 29, 2018, for all respondents.
Aug 24 2018Letter of August 24, 2018 from counsel for the Chicago Board of Election Commissioners submitted.
Aug 24 2018Letter of August 24, 2018 from counsel for the Rock Island County Clerk received.
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2018Reply of petitioners Luis Segovia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Geoffrey M. Wyatt
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

geoffrey.wyatt@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Luis Segovia , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Patricia Castro
    Counsel of Record
Rock Island State's Attorney Office
210 15th Street
Rock Island, IL 61201

castrop@co.rock-island.il.us
309-558-3232
Party name: Karen Kinney in her official capacity as Rock Island County Clerk
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Adam W. Lasker
    Counsel of Record
Lasker Law LLC
69 W. Washington St., #800
Chicago, IL 60602

ElectionAttorney@gmail.com
312-269-7900
Party name: Board of Election Commissioners for the City of Chicago and Marisel A. Hernandez in her official capacity as Chairwoman of said Board
Other
Charles Edward Buffon
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

cbuffon@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Voting Rights Scholars
John Michael Eubanks
    Counsel of Record
Motley Rice LLC
28 Bridgeside Boulevard
Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

jeubanks@motleyrice.com
843-216-9000
Party name: United States Virgin Islands
Jonathan Robert Ference-Burke
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

jonathan.ference-burke@ropesgray.com
202-508-4731
Party name: Constitutional Law Professors
Carlos Lugo-Fiol
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 260150
San Juan, PR 00926

clugofiol@gmail.com
(787) 645-4211
Party name: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Dwyer Arce
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1650 Farnam Street
The Omaha Building
Omaha, NE 68102

Dwyer.Arce@KutakRock.com
402.346.6000
Party name: Virgin Islands Bar Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543