Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1457
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1457
Title:Michelle Lowney MacDonald, Petitioner
v.
Lawyers Board of Professional Responsibility
Docketed:April 23, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A16-1282)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michelle Lowney MacDonald Shimota
    Counsel of Record
MacDonald Law Firm, LLC
1069 South Robert Street
West St. Paul, MN 55118

Debbie@MacDonaldLawFirm.com
651-222-4400
Party name: Michelle Lowney MacDonald

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543