Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1455
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1455
Title:Dwight E. Jordan, Petitioner
v.
City of Darien, Georgia, et al.
Docketed:April 23, 2018
Linked with 17A958
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17721)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2018Application (17A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to April 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 13 2018Application (17A958) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 16, 2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Waiver of right of respondent Nicholas Roundtree to respond filed.
Main Document
May 23 2018Brief of respondents City of Darien, Georgia, Archie Davis, Donnie Howard, and Anthony Brown in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2018Waiver of right of respondent Bonita Caldwell to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 12 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Dwight E. Jordan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Terry
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore LLP
1201 W. Peachtree Street, NW
3900 One Atlantic Center
Atlanta, GA 30309

terry@bmelaw.com
404-881-4100
Party name: Dwight E. Jordan
Attorneys for Respondents
Phillip L. Hartley
    Counsel of Record
Harben. Hartley & Hawkins, LLP
340 Jesse Jewell Parkway, STE 750
Gainesville, GA 30501

phartley@hhhlawyers.com
7705347341
Party name: Bonita Caldwell
Benjamin Mason Perkins
    Counsel of Record
Oliver Maner LLP
P.O. Box 10186
Savannah, GA 31412

bperkins@olivermaner.com
(912) 236-3311
Party name: Nicholas Roundtree
Richard Keith Strickland
    Counsel of Record
Brown, Readdick, et al.
5 Glynn Avenue
Brunswick, GA 31520

rstrickland@brbcsw.com
9122648544
Party name: City of Darien, Georgia, Archie Davis, Donnie Howard, and Anthony Brown

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543