Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1445
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1445
Vide 17-9127
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Michael Herrold
Docketed:April 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-11317)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
May 21 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Michael Herrold.
Main Document
May 21 2018Conditional Cross-Petition for a Writ of Certiorari of Michael Herrold not accepted for filing. (May 29, 2018)
May 21 2018Brief of respondent Michael Herrold in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79109

matthew_wright@fd.org
8063242370
Party name: Michael Herrold

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543