Docket for 17-1438
 | |
|
Feb 09 2018 | Application (17A856) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to April 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. (Justice Alito is recused.) | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Feb 12 2018 | Application (17A856) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 16, 2018. | | | Apr 16 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 27 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2018 to June 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 30 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2018. | | | May 14 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 18 2018 | Brief of respondent ConocoPhillips Co. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 02 2018 | Reply of petitioner Noble Energy, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|