Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1434
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1434
Title:Joseph P. Carson, Petitioner
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:April 16, 2018
Linked with 17A775
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-3135, 2015-3211)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2018Application (17A775) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2018 to April 12, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 24 2018Application (17A775) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 12, 2018.
Apr 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent Merit Systems Protection Board to respond filed.
Main Document
May 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Tom Devine, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
May 23 2018Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Joseph P. Carson.
Main Document
May 23 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph P. Carson
Blanket Consent
Jun 11 2018Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Jun 11 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Francis Douglas Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Elitok & Hartnett at Law, PLLC
1101 - 30th Street, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20007

dhartnett@elitokandhartnett.com
202-965-0529
Party name: Joseph P. Carson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merit Systems Protection Board
Other
David Brian Nolan Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of David B. Nolan, Sr.
97 Willow Run Drive
Centerville, MA 02632

DavidBrianNolanSr@gmail.com
571-277-3265
Party name: Tom Devine, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543