Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1428
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1428
Title:Ndioba Niang, et al., Petitioners
v.
Brittany Tomblinson, et al.
Docketed:April 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3968)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 14, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to June 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 13, 2018.
Apr 19 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Brittany Tomblinson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 24 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Ndioba Niang, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Choice Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 13, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 15, 2018.
Aug 15 2018Waiver of right of respondents Brittany Tomblinson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 29 2018Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2018)
Sep 13 2018Joint Suggestion of Mootness filed by petitioners Ndioba Niang, et al. and respondents Brittany Tomblinson, et al.
Main DocumentOther
Sep 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The judgment of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit is vacated and the case is remanded to that court with instructions to direct the District Court to dismiss the case as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950). Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Nov 13 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel Lamar Alban
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dalban@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Ndioba Niang, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Julie Marie Blake
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General, Supreme Court Building
207 W. High St. P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City,, MO 65102

julie.blake@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Brittany Tomblinson, et al.
Other
Anand Agneshwar
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
250 W. 55th St.
New York, NY 10019

Anand.Agneshwar@arnoldporter.com
212-836-8195
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Chad William Pekron
    Counsel of Record
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
111 Center Street, Suite 1900
Little Rock, AR 72201

cpekron@qgtlaw.com
501-379-1726
Party name: Public Choice Scholars
Lawrence G. Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

lsalzman@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
602-462-5000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543