Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1419
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1419
Title:Lummi Tribe of the Lummi Reservation, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:April 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2196)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2018 to June 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 11, 2018.
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2018 to July 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 11, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Brief of respondents United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 31 2018Reply of petitioners Lummi Tribe of the Lummi Reservation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Fredericks III
    Counsel of Record
Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP
3730 29th Avenue
Mandan, ND 58554

jfredericks@ndnlaw.com
303-673-9600
Party name: Lummi Tribe of the Lummi Reservation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543