Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1406
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1406
Title:Republic of Sudan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Monicah Okoba Opati, In Her Own Right, and as Executrix of the Estate of Caroline Setla Opati, Deceased, et al.
Docketed:April 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-7124, 14-7125, 14-7127, 14-7128)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2018Brief of respondents James Owens, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2018Brief of respondents Monicah Okoba Opati, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
May 22 2018Reply of petitioners The Republic of the Sudan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Supplemental brief of petitioners The Republic of the Sudan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202 626 3643
Party name: The Republic of the Sudan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: James Owens, et al.
Steven Robert Perles
    Counsel of Record
Perles Law Firm , PC
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

sperles@perleslaw.com
2029559055
Party name: Monicah Okoba Opati, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543