Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1397
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1397
Title:Steve Spencer, Petitioner
v.
Chris Abbott, et al.
Docketed:April 6, 2018
Linked with 17A871
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4009)
   Decision Date:December 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2018Application (17A871) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 5, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 15 2018Application (17A871) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 4, 2018.
Apr 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2018Waiver of right of respondents Chris Abbott, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 25 2018Response Requested. (Due June 25, 2018)
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Duncan
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Steve Spencer
Attorneys for Respondents
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Chris Abbott, et al.
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543