Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-137
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-137
Title:Millie Ogden, Petitioner
v.
Grant Kwok, et al.
Docketed:July 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55373, 15-55374)
   Decision Date:January 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017)
Aug 10 2017Waiver of right of respondents Grant Kwok, et al. to respond filed.
Aug 22 2017Brief of respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in opposition filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Ogden
    Counsel of Record
1108 W. Valley Blvd.
#6-862
Alhambra, CA 91803

Thomas@OgdenTaxLaw.com
(626) 344-8270
Party name: Millie Ogden
Attorneys for Respondents
Tod Vincent Beebe
    Counsel of Record
350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2200
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tbeebe@bkolaw.com
213-621-4000
Party name: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
David Martinez
    Counsel of Record
2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400
Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

dmartinez@robinskaplan.com
310-562-0130
Party name: Grant Kwok, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543