Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1366
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1366
Title:Stoney Lester, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10523)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due April 27, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan D. Hacker
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jhacker@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Stoney Lester
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543