Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1364
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1364
Title:North Carolina, et al., Appellants
v.
Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Docketed:March 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:15-CV-399)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 27, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 15 2018Reply of appellants State of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 26 2018Supplemental brief of appellants State of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Adjudged to be AFFIRMED in part and REVERSED in part. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). Justice Thomas, dissenting. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: State of North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Sandra Little Covington, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543