Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1356
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1356
Title:Umesh Kaushal, Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana, Fourth District
   Case Numbers:(49A04-1612-CR-2862)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 19, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Waiver of right of respondent Indiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 09 2018Response Requested. (Due May 9, 2018)
May 09 2018Brief of respondent Indiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2018Reply of petitioner Umesh Kaushal filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Jae Lee v. United States, 582 U. S. ____ (2017). Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, dissenting. (Detached Opinion)
Jul 30 2018MANDATE SSUED.
Jul 30 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harold Samuel Ansell III
    Counsel of Record
Ansell Law Firm, LLC
156 E. Market Street
Suite 900
Indianapolis, IN 46204

sam@attorneyansell.com
317-381-0371
Party name: Umesh Kaushal
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana
Stephen Richard CreasonOffice of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington St., 5th Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

steve.creason@atg.in.gov
317-232-6201
Party name: Indiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543