Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1348
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1348
Title:Nevada Department of Wildlife, Petitioner
v.
Mark E. Smith
Docketed:March 26, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C086233)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 21, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana and 42 other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2018Waiver of right of respondent Mark E. Smith to respond filed.
Main Document
May 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 03 2018Response Requested. (Due June 4, 2018)
May 30 2018Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Jun 01 2018Brief of respondent Mark E. Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 07 2018Reply of petitioner Nevada Department of Wildlife filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Franchise Tax Bd. of Cal. v. Hyatt, 587 U. S. ___ (2019).
Jun 21 2019MANDATE ISSUED.
Jun 21 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Morgan Conner
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada
100 N. Carson St.
Carson City, NV 89701

jconner@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: Nevada Department of Wildlife
Lawrence J. C. Van DykeOffice of the Nevada Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

lvandyke@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: Nevada Department of Wildlife
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephanie Rae Rice
    Counsel of Record
Winter Street Law Group
96 Winter Street
Reno, NV 89503

stephanie@winterstreetlawgroup.com
775-786-5800
Party name: Mark E. Smith
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana and 42 other States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543