Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1340
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1340
Title:Jeff Andersen, Secretary, Kansas Department of Health and Environment, Petitioner
v.
Planned Parenthood of Kansas and Mid-Missouri, et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3249)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2018.
Apr 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2018 to June 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 16 2018Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main Document
May 22 2018Motion to further extend the time to file a response denied.
May 23 2018Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood of Kansas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2018Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 01 2018Reply of petitioner Jeff Andersen, Secretary, Kansas Department of Health and Environment filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Rescheduled.
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
617-227-0548
Party name: Jeff Andersen, Secretary, Kansas Department of Health and Environment
Attorneys for Respondents
Diana Olga Salgado
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
1110 Vermont Ave., NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

diana.salgado@ppfa.org
202-973-4800
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Kansas, et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
2101 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 525
Suite 525
Arlington, VA 22201

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: Americans United for Life
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543