Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1332
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1332
Title:G. David Jang, Petitioner
v.
Boston Scientific Corporation, et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1275, 16-1575)
   Decision Date:September 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2018Waiver of right of respondents Boston Scientific Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 10 2018Response Requested. (Due May 10, 2018)
Apr 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2018 to June 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 11, 2018.
Jun 08 2018Brief of respondents Boston Scientific Corporation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2018Reply of petitioner G. David Jang, M.D. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: G. David Jang, M.D.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew McManus Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

matthew.wolf@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Boston Scientific Corporation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543