Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1330
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1330
Title:Sharp Image Gaming, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Shingle Springs Band of Miwok Indians
Docketed:March 22, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C070512)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 20, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to May 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2018Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner Sharp Image Gaming, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Apr 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2018.
May 22 2018Brief of respondent Shingle Springs Band of Miwok Indians in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 05 2018Reply of petitioner Sharp Image Gaming, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
555 Twin Dolphin Drive
5th Floor
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

danbromberg@quinnemanuel.com
650-801-5008
Party name: Sharp Image Gaming, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Paula M. Yost
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1999 Harrison Street
13th Floor
Oakland, CA 94612

paula.yost@dentons.com
415-882-5000
Party name: Shingle Springs Band of Miwok Indians

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543