Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-132
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-132
Title:James Lindsey, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:July 27, 2017
Linked with 16A1217
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(151111)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2017Application (16A1217) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2017 to July 24, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 14 2017Application (16A1217) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017)
Jul 31 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 17 2017Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2017)
Sep 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 01 2017Reply of petitioner James Lindsey filed. (Distributed)
Nov 17 2017Rescheduled.
Nov 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 11 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4190
Party name: James Lindsey
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Robert McGuire
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543