Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1318
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1318
Title:Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, dba Winchester Centre for Health and Rehabilitation, nka Fountain Circle Health and Rehabilitation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Beverly Wellner, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Joe P. Wellner, Deceased
Docketed:March 20, 2018
Linked with 17A773
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2013-SC-000431-I)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2018Application (17A773) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2018 to March 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Application (17A773) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 16, 2018.
Mar 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Beverly Wellner to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Apr 26 2018Response Requested. (Due May 29, 2018)
May 29 2018Brief of respondent Beverly Wellner in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 13 2018Reply of petitioners Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Kindred Nursing Centers Limited Partnership, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Earl Salyer
    Counsel of Record
Wilkes & McHugh, P.A.
429 North Broadway
P.O. Box 1747
Lexington, KY 40588-1747

rsalyer@wilkesmchugh.com
8594553356
Party name: Beverly Wellner

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543